Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/26/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/26/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 05/26/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/26/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 05/26/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/03/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/03/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 06/03/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/03/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/03/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/03/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/13/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 06/13/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/13/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 06/13/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/13/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/13/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/13/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 06/13/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/15/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 06/15/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 06/15/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 06/15/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 06/15/2011
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 06/15/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/15/2011
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 06/21/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/21/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/21/2011
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 06/23/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/23/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 06/24/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/24/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/05/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 07/05/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/05/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/05/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/06/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 07/06/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/06/2011