Refine your search

Refined by:

Georgia Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/26/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/03/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/13/2011
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/13/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 06/15/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/21/2011
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 06/21/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/21/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/21/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 06/23/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/06/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 07/06/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/06/2011