Refine your search

Refined by:

Michigan Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/26/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 05/26/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/26/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 05/26/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/26/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 06/13/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/14/2011
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/23/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/05/2011