Refine your search

Refined by:

Missouri Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/03/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/03/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 06/13/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 06/21/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/23/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/06/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/06/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/07/2011