Refine your search

Refined by:

New Jersey Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/26/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/26/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/26/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/26/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/26/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/03/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 06/13/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/13/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 06/13/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/14/2011
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/23/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/06/2011