Refine your search

Refined by:

North Carolina Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/26/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 05/26/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/03/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/13/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 06/13/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/21/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/23/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 07/06/2011