Refine your search

Refined by:

Ohio Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 05/26/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/26/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 06/03/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/03/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/03/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/03/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/13/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 06/13/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/14/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/15/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 06/21/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/21/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/05/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/05/2011
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 07/05/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/06/2011