Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/26/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/26/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/26/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/26/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/26/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/26/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 05/26/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/03/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/03/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 06/13/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/13/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/14/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 06/15/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/21/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 06/21/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 06/21/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 07/05/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/06/2011