Refine your search

Refined by:

Tennessee Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/26/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 06/03/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 06/13/2011
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/14/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 06/15/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/21/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/05/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 07/06/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/06/2011