Refine your search

Refined by:

Washington Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 05/26/2011
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/26/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/03/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/13/2011
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/05/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/06/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/06/2011
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/06/2011