Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8]* 05/23/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 05/23/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 05/23/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3]* 05/23/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 08/01/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 09/15/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 11/03/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 11/03/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 11/03/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 11/03/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/03/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 11/03/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 11/03/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 11/03/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 11/03/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 11/03/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 11/03/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 11/03/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 11/03/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 11/03/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 11/03/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 12/12/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/23/2012
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 02/16/2012
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/29/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/29/2012
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/05/2012
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 03/05/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/07/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 04/16/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/18/2012
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/09/2012
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 05/09/2012