Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 05/26/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/24/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/24/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 06/24/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/06/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/06/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/06/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/06/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/21/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/21/2011
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 07/21/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/21/2011
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 07/21/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 09/07/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/07/2011
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/18/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/01/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 11/10/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/10/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/10/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/15/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 12/06/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 12/12/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 12/15/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 01/17/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/25/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/25/2012
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 02/08/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 02/14/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/14/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/05/2012
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 03/20/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/20/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/20/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/20/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 03/20/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 04/17/2012
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 04/24/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/27/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/27/2012
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 05/07/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/15/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/16/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 05/17/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/05/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/05/2012