Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 06/01/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/01/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/01/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/01/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 06/01/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/01/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/01/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 06/01/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 06/01/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17]* 06/01/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/01/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/01/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/01/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/01/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 06/01/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/15/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/15/2011
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/15/2011
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 06/15/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/15/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/21/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/21/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/21/2011
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/21/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/21/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/21/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 06/21/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/21/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/21/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/21/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 06/21/2011
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/21/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/06/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/06/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/06/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/07/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/07/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/15/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/15/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/10/2012