Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/14/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/14/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 06/14/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/14/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/14/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/22/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/22/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/22/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/24/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/24/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/06/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/06/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/06/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/06/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 07/06/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/14/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/14/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/15/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/22/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/25/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/27/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/27/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/27/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/27/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/29/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 08/01/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/08/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 09/08/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/21/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 10/05/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/05/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 10/27/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/02/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/17/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 11/17/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 11/17/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/19/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/17/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/12/2012
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 09/20/2012