Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19]* 06/03/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/03/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 06/03/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 06/03/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 06/03/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8]* 06/03/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 06/03/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 06/03/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 06/03/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 06/03/2011
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 06/03/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/03/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 06/03/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 06/03/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 06/03/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/13/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/13/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 06/14/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/14/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 06/14/2011
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/16/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/16/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/16/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/16/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 06/16/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/16/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 06/16/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/16/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/16/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/16/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/08/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 08/01/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 08/30/2011