There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Urging the Republic of Turkey to safeguard its Christian heritage and to return confiscated church properties.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
12/13/2011Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8873)
06/15/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
12/13/2011-10:36pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/13/2011-10:36pmOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8873)
12/13/2011-10:00pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 306.
12/13/2011-10:00pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8873-8878)
12/13/2011-10:00pmMr. Royce moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
08/02/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe and Eurasia.
06/15/2011Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
06/15/2011Introduced in House

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/15/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 06/15/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/01/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 07/12/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/12/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/19/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 08/12/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/08/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/21/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 11/14/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 11/18/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 11/30/2011
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 06/15/2011 07/13/2011 --

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs06/15/2011 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Europe and Eurasia08/02/2011 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.306. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (12/13/2011)

Expresses the sense of the House of Representatives that the Secretary of State, in all official contacts with Turkish leaders and officials, should emphasize that Turkey should: (1) end all forms of religious discrimination; (2) allow the rightful church and lay owners of Christian church properties to organize prayer services, religious education, clerical training, social services, and other religious activities; (3) return to their rightful owners all Christian churches and other places of worship, monasteries, schools, hospitals, holy sites, and other religious properties, including artwork and manuscripts; and (4) allow the rightful church and lay owners of Christian church properties to preserve and reconstruct all Christian churches and other places of worship, monasteries, schools, hospitals, holy sites, and other religious properties within Turkey.