There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives with respect to the tragic shooting in Tucson, Arizona, on January 8, 2011.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
01/12/2011Passed/agreed to in House: On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H144)
01/12/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date All Actions
01/12/2011-5:58pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/12/2011-5:58pmOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H144)
01/12/2011-5:58pmThe previous question was ordered without objection. (consideration: CR H200)
01/12/2011-1:56pmDEBATE - The Chair announced that when proceedings were postponed earlier, 4 hours and 6 minutes of debate remained on the resolution. The House proceeded with further debate on H. Res. 32.
01/12/2011-1:56pmConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H160-200)
01/12/2011-1:56pmThe Chair announced that pursuant to clause 1(c) of rule 19, proceedings would resume on H. Res. 32.
01/12/2011-12:42pmPOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - The Chair announced that further proceedings on H.Res. 32 would be postponed.
01/12/2011-10:09amDEBATE - Pursuant to a previous special order the House proceeded with 6 hours of debate on H.Res. 32.
01/12/2011-10:06amConsidered pursuant to a special order. (consideration: CR H144-160)
01/12/2011-10:05amConsideration initiated pursuant to a special order.
01/12/2011Introduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (0)

As of 10/27/2020 text has not been received for H.Res.32 - Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives with respect to the tragic shooting in Tucson, Arizona, on January 8, 2011.

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.32. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (01/12/2011)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Condemns in the strongest possible terms the horrific attack that occurred at the "Congress on your Corner" event hosted by Representative Gabrielle Giffords in Tucson, Arizona, on January 8, 2011.

Offers heartfelt condolences to the families, friends, and loved ones of those killed in that attack.

Expresses hope for the rapid and complete recovery of those wounded in the shooting.

Honors the memory of Christina Taylor Green, Dorothy Morris, John Roll, Phyllis Schneck, Dorwan Stoddard, and Gabriel Zimmerman.

Applauds the bravery and quick thinking exhibited by those who prevented the gunman from taking more lives and helped to save those who had been wounded.

Recognizes the service of the first responders who raced to the scene and the health care professionals who tended to the victims once they reached the hospital and whose service and skill saved lives.

Reaffirms the bedrock principle of American democracy and representative government, memorialized in the First Amendment and which Representative Giffords herself read in the Hall of the House of Representatives on January 6, 2011, of "the right of the people peaceably to assemble, and to petition the Government for a redress of grievances."

Stands firm in the belief in a democracy in which all can participate and in which intimidation and threats of violence cannot silence the voices of any American.

Honors the service and leadership of Representative Giffords, a distinguished Member of the House of Representatives, as she courageously fights to recover.

States that when the House adjourns on January 12, 2011, it does so out of respect to the victims of this attack.