There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Welcoming and commending the Government of Japan for extending an official apology to all United States former prisoners of war from the Pacific War and establishing in 2010 a visitation program to Japan for surviving veterans, family members, and descendants.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/24/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
08/02/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific.
06/24/2011Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
06/24/2011Introduced in House

Cosponsors (39)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/06/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/06/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 07/06/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/06/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 07/06/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/06/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/18/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/20/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/29/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/29/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/29/2011
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 09/14/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/14/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 09/21/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/21/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/21/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/21/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 11/30/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/30/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 01/24/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/24/2012
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/22/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/25/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/25/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/25/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs06/24/2011 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific08/02/2011 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.333. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/24/2011)

Commends the government of Japan for extending an official apology to all U.S. former prisoners of war from the Pacific War and establishing a visitation program to Japan for surviving veterans, their families, and descendants.

Appreciates the government of Japan's efforts toward historic apologies for the war crimes of Imperial Japan.

Requests that the government of Japan: (1) continue its Japanese/American POW Friendship Program of reconciliation and remembrance and expand it to educate the public and its school children about the history of prisoners of war in Imperial Japan, and (2) respect the wishes and sensibilities of the U.S. former prisoners of war by requesting successor Japanese firms of private entities that used U.S. prisoner of war labor to emulate their government's sincerity by offering an apology and supporting programs for lasting remembrance and reconciliation.

Acknowledges the work of the Department of State in advocating for the U.S. prisoners of war from the Pacific War.

Applauds the dedication and patriotism of the members and descendants of the American Defenders of Bataan and Corregidor for their pursuit of justice and lasting peace.