Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/06/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/06/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 07/06/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/06/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 07/06/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/06/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/18/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/20/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/29/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/29/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/29/2011
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 09/14/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/14/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 09/21/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/21/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/21/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/21/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 11/30/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/30/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 01/24/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/24/2012
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/22/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/25/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/25/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/25/2012