Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/25/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 01/25/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 01/25/2011
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 01/25/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/25/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/25/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 01/25/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 01/25/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 01/25/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 01/25/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 01/25/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/25/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 01/25/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/16/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 02/16/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/16/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 02/16/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 02/16/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/28/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/11/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/11/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/11/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/11/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 03/11/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/11/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/11/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/11/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/11/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/11/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/11/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/11/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/11/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/11/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 03/11/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/11/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/11/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/30/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 03/30/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/01/2011