Text: H.Res.34 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)All Bill Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/12/2011)


112th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. RES. 34

Expressing condolences to and solidarity with the people of the Commonwealth of Australia as they struggle against deadly floods that began on December 24, 2010.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
January 12, 2011

Mr. Johnson of Georgia (for himself, Mr. Bilbray, Mr. Lewis of Georgia, Mr. Westmoreland, Mr. Bishop of Georgia, and Mr. David Scott of Georgia) submitted the following resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs


RESOLUTION

Expressing condolences to and solidarity with the people of the Commonwealth of Australia as they struggle against deadly floods that began on December 24, 2010.

Whereas in late December of 2010 and January of 2011 torrential rains poured down on Queensland, Australia, causing widespread flooding;

Whereas, as of January 12, 2011, over 200,000 people have been detrimentally affected by the flooding, including at least 12 who have died and 78 who are still missing;

Whereas the floods have spread into a second state, New South Wales, and now affect a total area larger than the State of Texas;

Whereas at least 22 Queensland towns remain isolated or inundated by the rising waters;

Whereas Queensland Premier Anna Bligh has declared more than half of Queensland a disaster zone, and Queensland officials estimate that the flooding could cause up to $5,000,000,000 in damages;

Whereas according to Australia’s Department of Foreign Affairs and Trade, Queensland accounted for 19 percent of Australia’s gross domestic product in 2009–2010;

Whereas the flood waters have destroyed much of Queensland’s economic infrastructure;

Whereas the heavy rains continue and Australia’s Bureau of Meteorology warned on January 11, 2011, that more flooding will likely occur;

Whereas Brisbane, Australia’s third largest city, is at risk of severe flooding such that water is expected to overwhelm the dam built after the devastating 1974 flood;

Whereas Campbell Newman, the Lord Mayor of Brisbane, has estimated that more than 20,000 homes are in danger;

Whereas the United States and Australia are friends and allies and have long maintained a partnership marked by superb cooperation and mutual support in times of both war and peace;

Whereas the United States Embassy in Australia has pledged to fully support Prime Minister Julia Gillard and Queensland Premier Anna Bligh as they respond to the floods;

Whereas United States Embassy personnel in Australia are donating to the Premier’s Flood Relief Appeal, volunteering to assist affected communities, and connecting with American businesses that are interested in donating food, clothing, furniture, or expertise to those in need; and

Whereas Secretary of State Hillary Clinton affirmed on January 3, 2011, “Australia is an important partner and close friend of the United States and we stand ready to provide assistance”: Now, therefore, be it

Resolved, That the House of Representatives—

(1) expresses condolences to and solidarity with the people of the Commonwealth of Australia as they struggle against these deadly floods that began on December 24, 2010;

(2) mourns the loss of life resulting from the floods and expresses its deep sympathy for the survivors, those affected and their families;

(3) pledges its full support and assistance as Australia searches for missing persons, continues to battle the floodwaters, and rebuilds in the aftermath;

(4) supports continuing efforts by the United States Government, United States relief agencies, and private citizens to assist Australia as it copes with this natural disaster; and

(5) urges the United States Government and the internal community to provide additional assistance to aid flood victims and support reconstruction efforts.