Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 07/07/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/13/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/13/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 07/13/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/13/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/13/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/13/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/13/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/13/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/13/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/13/2011
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 07/13/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/13/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/13/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/13/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/18/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 07/19/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/26/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/27/2011
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 07/27/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/27/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/28/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/29/2011