Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 01/12/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 01/18/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 01/18/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 01/18/2011
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 01/18/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 01/18/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 01/18/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 01/18/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/18/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/18/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/18/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/20/2011
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 01/20/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 01/24/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 01/24/2011
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 01/24/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 02/11/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 02/11/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 02/11/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/11/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/11/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/11/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/11/2011
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/11/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 02/11/2011
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 02/11/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/11/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/11/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/11/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/11/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/11/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/11/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/11/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 02/11/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/11/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 02/11/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 02/11/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/16/2011