Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/25/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 07/25/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/25/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/25/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/25/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/25/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/25/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/25/2011
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/25/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/25/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/25/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/25/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/25/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/25/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/25/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/25/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/25/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/25/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/25/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/25/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/26/2011
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 07/26/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/26/2011
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/26/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 07/26/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/26/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/26/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/26/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/26/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/26/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/26/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/26/2011
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/26/2011
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 07/26/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/26/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/26/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/26/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/26/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/26/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/26/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/26/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/26/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/26/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 07/27/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/27/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/27/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/27/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/27/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/27/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/27/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/29/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/29/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/29/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 08/05/2011