Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 08/19/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 08/19/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 08/19/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 08/19/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 08/19/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 08/19/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 08/19/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 08/19/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 08/19/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 08/19/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 08/19/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 08/19/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/20/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/05/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/26/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/04/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 12/07/2011