Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 07/28/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/08/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/16/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 12/12/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 12/20/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 02/01/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/07/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 09/10/2012