There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Calling for the repatriation of POW/MIAs and abductees from the Korean War.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
12/13/2011Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8870-8871)
07/27/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
12/13/2011-9:58pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/13/2011-9:58pmOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8870-8871)
12/13/2011-9:43pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 376.
12/13/2011-9:43pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8870-8873)
12/13/2011-9:43pmMs. Ros-Lehtinen moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
11/30/2011Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
11/30/2011Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
10/25/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific.
07/27/2011Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
07/27/2011Introduced in House

Cosponsors (59)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/24/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/24/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/24/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/24/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 10/26/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/26/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 10/26/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/26/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 10/26/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 10/26/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/26/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 10/26/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/26/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/26/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/26/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 10/26/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/26/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/26/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/26/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/26/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/26/2011
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/01/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 11/01/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/01/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/01/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/01/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 11/01/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/01/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/01/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 11/01/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 11/01/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/01/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 11/01/2011
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 11/01/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 11/03/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 11/03/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 11/03/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 11/03/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 11/04/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 11/04/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 11/14/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 11/14/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 11/14/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/14/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 11/14/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 11/18/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 11/29/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 11/29/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 11/29/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 11/29/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 11/29/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/29/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/29/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 11/29/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 11/29/2011
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 11/30/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/02/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/13/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 12/13/2011

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs07/27/2011 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific10/25/2011 Referred to
11/30/2011 Markup by
11/30/2011 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.Res.376.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.376. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (12/13/2011)

Recognizes there are South Korean prisoners of war (POWs) and civilian abductees from the Korean War who are still alive in North Korea and who want to be repatriated.

Takes note of the U.S.-North Korean agreement of October 20, 2011, on resuming operations to search for and recover remains of American POW/MIAs, and calls upon the U.S. government to continue to explore the possibility that there could be American POW/MIAs still alive inside North Korea.

Recommends that the United States and South Korea jointly investigate reports of sightings of American POW/MIAs.

Encourages North Korea to repatriate American and South Korean POWs.

Calls upon North Korea to: (1) admit to the abduction of more than 100,000 South Korean civilians and reveal the status of the abductees; and (2) agree to family reunions and repatriation of the abductees.