Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 10/26/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 10/26/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/26/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 10/26/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/26/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/26/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/26/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 11/01/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 11/01/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 11/03/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 11/14/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 11/29/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 11/29/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 11/29/2011