Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/09/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/09/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/09/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 09/09/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/14/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/22/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/04/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 10/04/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 10/04/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/12/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/03/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/15/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/07/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/17/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/30/2012