Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/28/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 07/28/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 07/29/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/29/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/29/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/29/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/29/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/30/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 08/01/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 08/05/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 08/05/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 08/05/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 08/05/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 08/05/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 08/05/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 08/05/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 08/05/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 08/05/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 08/05/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 08/05/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 08/05/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 08/05/2011