Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 07/28/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/29/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 07/29/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/29/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/29/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/29/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/29/2011
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/29/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/29/2011
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/29/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/29/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/29/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/29/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/29/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/29/2011
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 07/29/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/30/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 08/01/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 08/01/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 08/01/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 08/05/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 09/07/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 09/09/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 10/03/2011