Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 08/01/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 08/01/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 08/01/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 08/09/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/07/2011
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/07/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/14/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 10/03/2011