Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/23/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 09/23/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/23/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/06/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 06/19/2012
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 09/20/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 09/21/2012
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 09/21/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/21/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/13/2012