Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 09/12/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 09/12/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 09/14/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 09/14/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 09/14/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 09/14/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/14/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/14/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 09/14/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/14/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/14/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 09/14/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 09/14/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/14/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/14/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 09/15/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 09/15/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/15/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/15/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 09/15/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 09/15/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 09/15/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 09/15/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 09/15/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 09/19/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 09/20/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 09/20/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 09/20/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 09/20/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 09/20/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/20/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 09/20/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 09/20/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 09/21/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 09/21/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 09/21/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/21/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/21/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/21/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 09/22/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/04/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 10/04/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 04/19/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/23/2012