Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/23/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/11/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/13/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/25/2011