Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/26/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 10/26/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/26/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 10/26/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 10/26/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/26/2011
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/26/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 10/26/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/26/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/26/2011
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 10/26/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 10/26/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/26/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 10/26/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 10/26/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 10/26/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/26/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 10/26/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 10/26/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 10/26/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 10/26/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 10/26/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/26/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/26/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/26/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 10/26/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/26/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 10/26/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 10/26/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 10/26/2011
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 10/26/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 10/26/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 10/26/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 10/26/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 10/26/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 10/26/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 10/26/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/26/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 10/26/2011
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/26/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 10/26/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 10/26/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/01/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/01/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 11/01/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 11/01/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/02/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 11/04/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 11/17/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/17/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/29/2011