Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 11/01/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 11/01/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 11/01/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 11/01/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 11/01/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 11/03/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 11/03/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/03/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/03/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/03/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 11/03/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 11/15/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 11/15/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 11/15/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 11/18/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 12/12/2011