Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/14/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/14/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/14/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 02/14/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/14/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/14/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/10/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/10/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/10/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/10/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/10/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/10/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/10/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/29/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/29/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/29/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/15/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/15/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/13/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/26/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 06/21/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/21/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 07/19/2011