Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 11/29/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 11/29/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/29/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/30/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 12/02/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 12/02/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 12/14/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 12/14/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 01/24/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/17/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/17/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/06/2012
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/06/2012