Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 01/18/2012
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 02/27/2012
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/22/2012
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/22/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/22/2012
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 06/29/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/11/2012