Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/12/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 12/12/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/12/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 12/12/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 12/12/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 12/12/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 12/12/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 12/13/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 12/13/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 12/13/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 12/13/2011
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 12/13/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 12/13/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 12/13/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 12/13/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 12/13/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 12/13/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 12/13/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 12/13/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 12/13/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 12/13/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 12/13/2011
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 12/13/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 12/13/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 12/13/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 12/13/2011
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 12/14/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 12/14/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 12/14/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 12/14/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 12/14/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 12/14/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 12/14/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 12/14/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 12/14/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 12/14/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 12/14/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 12/14/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 12/14/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 12/14/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 12/14/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 12/14/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 12/14/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 12/14/2011
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 12/14/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 12/14/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 12/14/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 12/14/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 12/14/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 12/14/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 12/14/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 12/14/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 12/14/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 12/14/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 12/19/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 12/19/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 12/19/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 12/19/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/19/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 12/19/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 12/19/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 12/19/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/19/2011
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 12/19/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 12/19/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 12/19/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 12/19/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 12/20/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 12/20/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 12/20/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 12/20/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 12/20/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 12/20/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 12/20/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 12/20/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 12/23/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 01/06/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 01/10/2012
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 01/10/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 01/24/2012