Text: H.Res.510 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)All Bill Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/17/2012)


112th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. RES. 510

Recognizing the anniversary of the tragic earthquake in Haiti on January 12, 2010, honoring those who lost their lives, and expressing continued solidarity with the Haitian people.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
January 13, 2012

Ms. Lee of California (for herself, Ms. Bass of California, Ms. Bordallo, Ms. Brown of Florida, Mr. Butterfield, Mr. Capuano, Ms. Clarke of New York, Mr. Cohen, Mr. Conyers, Mr. Cummings, Mr. Al Green of Texas, Mr. Grijalva, Mr. Gutierrez, Mr. Hastings of Florida, Mr. Honda, Ms. Jackson Lee of Texas, Mr. Johnson of Georgia, Mr. Lewis of Georgia, Mr. McGovern, Ms. Moore, Ms. Norton, Mr. Payne, Mr. Price of North Carolina, Mr. Rush, Mr. Towns, Mr. Van Hollen, Ms. Waters, Ms. Wilson of Florida, and Ms. Woolsey) submitted the following resolution

January 17, 2012

Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs


RESOLUTION

Recognizing the anniversary of the tragic earthquake in Haiti on January 12, 2010, honoring those who lost their lives, and expressing continued solidarity with the Haitian people.

Whereas, on January 12, 2010, a 7.0 magnitude earthquake struck the country of Haiti;

Whereas according to the United States Geological Survey (USGS), the earthquake epicenter was located approximately 15 miles southwest of the capital, Port-au-Prince;

Whereas, according to USGS, the earthquake was followed by 59 aftershocks of magnitude 4.5 or greater, the most severe measuring 6.0;

Whereas according to the Government of Haiti, more than 316,000 people died as a result of the earthquake;

Whereas according to the United Nations and the International Organization for Migration, an estimated 3,000,000 people have been directly affected by the disaster, nearly one-third of the country’s population, and 1,300,000 people were displaced to settlements;

Whereas casualty numbers and infrastructure damage, including to roads, ports, hospitals, and residential dwellings, place the earthquake as the worst cataclysm to hit Haiti in over two centuries and, proportionally, one of the world’s worst natural disasters in modern times;

Whereas the Post Disaster Needs Assessment (PDNA) conducted by the Government of Haiti, the United Nations, the World Bank, the Inter-American Development Bank, and other experts estimates that damage and economic losses totaled $7,800,000,000, approximately 120 percent of Haiti’s gross domestic product in 2009;

Whereas the PDNA estimates that $11,500,000,000 over three years is required for Haiti’s reconstruction and to lay the groundwork for long-term development;

Whereas Haiti is the poorest, least developed country in the Western Hemisphere with, prior to the earthquake, more than 70 percent of Haitians living on less than $2 per day and a ranking of 149 out of 182 countries on the United Nations Human Development Index;

Whereas prior to the earthquake, Haiti was still in the process of recovering from a catastrophic series of hurricanes and tropical storms, food shortages and rising commodity prices, and political instability, but was showing encouraging signs of improvement;

Whereas President Barack Obama vowed the “unwavering support” of the United States and pledged a “swift, coordinated and aggressive effort to save lives and support the recovery in Haiti”;

Whereas Congress passed House Resolution 1021 on January 21, 2010, on a vote of 411 to 1, expressing its “deepest condolences and sympathy for the horrific loss of life” and bipartisan “support for the recovery and long-term reconstruction needs of Haiti”;

Whereas the response to the tragedy from the global community, and especially from the countries of the Western Hemisphere, has been overwhelmingly positive;

Whereas the initial emergency response of the men and women of the United States Government, led by the United States Agency for International Development and United States Southern Command, was swift and resolute;

Whereas individuals, businesses, and philanthropic organizations across the United States and throughout the international community responded in support of Haiti and its populace during this crisis, sometimes in innovative ways such as fundraising through text messaging, which some estimates reveal has raised more than $40,000,000;

Whereas significant challenges still remain in Haiti as it works to recover and rebuild;

Whereas according to the International Organization for Migration, approximately 550,000 people remain in spontaneous and organized camps in Haiti;

Whereas according to numerous nongovernmental organizations and United States contractors, the pace of reconstruction has lagged significantly behind the original emergency relief phase;

Whereas according to an independent United Nations panel investigation, on October 19, 2010, an outbreak of cholera was detected in the Lower Artibonite region, originating from a tributary near the Minustah camp at Mirebelais, where the panel found that sanitation conditions “were not sufficient to prevent fecal contamination of the Meye Tributary System of the Artibonite River”;

Whereas initial efforts to contain the epidemic were disrupted by Hurricane Tomás and resulting widespread flooding, which led to the spreading and entrenchment of the disease throughout the country;

Whereas according to the Haitian Ministry of Public Health and Population, as of November 30, 2011, more than 6,900 people have died from cholera and more than 500,000 affected;

Whereas throughout these crises, the people of Haiti continue to demonstrate unwavering resilience, dignity, and courage;

Whereas at the international donors conference “Towards a New Future for Haiti” held on March 31, 2010, 59 donors pledged approximately $5,600,000,000, including nearly $1,150,000,000 from the United States, to support the Government of Haiti’s Action Plan for National Recovery and Development;

Whereas the United Nations Office of the Special Envoy for Haiti estimates that of the recovery and development funds pledged for 2010–2011, approximately 43 percent has been disbursed; and

Whereas Haiti requires the sustained assistance from the United States and the international community in order to confront the ongoing cholera epidemic and promote reconstruction and development: Now, therefore, be it

Resolved, That the House of Representatives—

(1) honors those who lost their lives due to the tragic earthquake of January 12, 2010;

(2) honors the sacrifice of the men and women of the Government of Haiti, the United States Government, the United Nations, and the international community in their response to those affected by the calamity;

(3) expresses continued solidarity with the people of Haiti as they work to rebuild their neighborhoods, livelihoods, and country;

(4) reaffirms its commitment to support Haiti, in partnership with the Government of Haiti and in coordination with other donors, in long-term reconstruction;

(5) supports the efforts of the Administration to prevent the spread of cholera, treat persons who contract the disease, provide technical assistance to the Haitian Ministry of Public Health, and improve longer-term water, sanitation, and health systems;

(6) urges the President and the international community to—

(A) continue to focus assistance on building the capacity of Haiti’s public sector to sustainably provide basic services to its people;

(B) develop, improve, and scale-up communications and participatory mechanisms to more substantially involve Haitian civil society at all stages of the cholera and post-earthquake responses; and

(C) give priority to programs that protect and involve vulnerable populations, including internally displaced persons, children, women and girls, and persons with disabilities; and

(7) urges the President to—

(A) continue to make available to United States agencies, nongovernmental organizations, private volunteer organizations, regional institutions, and United Nations agencies the resources necessary to confront the consequences of the natural disaster;

(B) undertake comprehensive assessments of the long-term needs for investing in public health, building adequate water and sanitation infrastructure, and transparent accountability mechanisms, particularly in relation to the cholera epidemic in Haiti;

(C) continue to lead humanitarian and development efforts with the Government of Haiti, the Haitian Diaspora, and international actors who share in the goal of a better future for Haiti;

(D) maximize local and regional procurement;

(E) establish improved and transparent mechanisms for monitoring the implementation of United States Government-funded aid programs; and

(F) work with Haitian authorities and private landowners to prevent the forced eviction of internally displaced person communities.