Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 01/23/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/31/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/17/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/10/2012
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/10/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/29/2012