Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 02/08/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 02/29/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/08/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 03/21/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 04/25/2012