Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 01/24/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/02/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/01/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/05/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/08/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 03/21/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 03/28/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/16/2012
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 04/16/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/15/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/10/2012