Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 02/17/2012
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 02/17/2012
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/17/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/17/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/17/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 02/17/2012
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 02/24/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/24/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/24/2012
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/24/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/24/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 02/24/2012
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 02/24/2012
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 02/24/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/24/2012
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 02/24/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/24/2012
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 02/24/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/24/2012
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 02/24/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 02/24/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/24/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 02/24/2012
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/24/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/24/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/24/2012
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/24/2012
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 02/24/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 02/27/2012
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 02/27/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/27/2012
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 02/27/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 02/27/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 02/27/2012
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 02/27/2012
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/27/2012
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/27/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 02/27/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/27/2012
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/27/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 02/27/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/27/2012
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 02/27/2012
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 02/27/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/27/2012
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/27/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 02/28/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/28/2012
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/28/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/28/2012
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/28/2012
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 02/28/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/28/2012
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/28/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 02/28/2012
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 02/28/2012
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 02/28/2012
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 02/28/2012
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 02/28/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 02/28/2012
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/28/2012
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 02/28/2012
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 02/28/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 02/28/2012
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 02/28/2012
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 02/28/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 02/28/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/28/2012
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 02/28/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 02/28/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/28/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 02/28/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/29/2012
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 02/29/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/29/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 02/29/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 02/29/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 02/29/2012
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 02/29/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 02/29/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/29/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/29/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 02/29/2012
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/29/2012
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 02/29/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 02/29/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 02/29/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 02/29/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/29/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 02/29/2012
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-8] 02/29/2012
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 02/29/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 02/29/2012
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 02/29/2012
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 02/29/2012
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 02/29/2012
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 02/29/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/29/2012
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 02/29/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/29/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 02/29/2012
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/29/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/29/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 02/29/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 02/29/2012
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 02/29/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 02/29/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/29/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 02/29/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/29/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/29/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/29/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/29/2012
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 02/29/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/29/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/29/2012
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 02/29/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 02/29/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 02/29/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/29/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/29/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/29/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/29/2012