Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 02/17/2012
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 02/17/2012
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 02/17/2012
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 02/17/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/27/2012
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/28/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/07/2012
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/07/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/07/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/07/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/07/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/07/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/07/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/07/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/07/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/07/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/07/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/08/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/08/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/08/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/08/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/08/2012
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/13/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/13/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/13/2012
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/13/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/13/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/13/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/13/2012
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/16/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/16/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/20/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/21/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/22/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/26/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/27/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 04/16/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/16/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/17/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/10/2012