Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/20/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/21/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/26/2012
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/19/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/15/2012