Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/08/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/08/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 02/08/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 02/17/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 02/18/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/18/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/10/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/11/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/16/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 06/03/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 06/23/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/13/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/25/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 08/01/2011