Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/02/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 03/15/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/31/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 07/06/2011